Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/05/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 06/05/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/15/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/18/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/19/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/27/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/27/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/27/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/27/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/11/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 08/04/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/15/2007