Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/14/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/14/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/28/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/11/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/11/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/18/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/18/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/26/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 08/02/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 08/02/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/20/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 10/02/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/05/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/11/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/30/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/30/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/24/2008