Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/06/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/06/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/07/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/13/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/14/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/23/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/29/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/29/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/29/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/05/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/13/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/08/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/07/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/13/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/04/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/23/2008