Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/11/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/11/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/13/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/13/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/13/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/18/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/18/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/21/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/25/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/25/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/27/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/12/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/16/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/07/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/19/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/25/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/25/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/10/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/05/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/13/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/13/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/28/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/31/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/08/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/08/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/10/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/15/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/15/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/15/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/22/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/23/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/24/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/24/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/24/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/19/2008