Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/06/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/07/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/07/2007