There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

SSI Extension for Elderly and Disabled Refugees Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SSI Extension for Elderly and Disabled Refugees Act

Short Titles as Introduced

SSI Extension for Elderly and Disabled Refugees Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

SSI Extension for Elderly and Disabled Refugees Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 402 of the Personal Responsibility and Work Opportunity Reconciliation Act of 1996 to provide, in fiscal years 2008 through 2010, extensions of supplemental security income for refugees, asylees, and certain other humanitarian immigrants, and to amend the Internal Revenue Code to collect unemployment compensation debts resulting from fraud.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An act to amend section 402 of the Personal Responsibility and Work Opportunity Reconciliation Act of 1996 to provide, in fiscal years 2009 through 2011, extensions of supplemental security income for refugees, asylees, and certain other humanitarian immigrants, and to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to collect unemployment compensation debts resulting from fraud.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
09/30/2008Became Public Law No: 110-328. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2008Signed by President.
09/23/2008Presented to President.
09/17/2008Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.
08/01/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2008Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/11/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7559-7560)
06/07/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
09/30/2008Became Public Law No: 110-328. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2008Signed by President.
09/23/2008HousePresented to President.
09/17/2008-12:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/17/2008-12:37pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.
09/17/2008-12:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 2608.
09/17/2008-12:12pmHouseMr. McDermott moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H8298-8304)
08/01/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2008SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2008SenateS.Amdt.5261 Amendment SA 5261 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2008SenateS.Amdt.5261 Amendment SA 5261 proposed by Senator Cantwell for Senator Smith. (consideration: CR S8004; text: CR S8004) To amend the title.
08/01/2008SenateS.Amdt.5260 Amendment SA 5260 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2008SenateS.Amdt.5260 Amendment SA 5260 proposed by Senator Cantwell for Senator Smith. (consideration: CR S8004) In the nature of a substitute.
08/01/2008SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8003-8004)
08/01/2008SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/16/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
07/11/2007-4:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/11/2007-4:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7559-7560)
07/11/2007-4:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2608.
07/11/2007-4:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7559-7566)
07/11/2007-4:12pmHouseMr. McDermott moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/12/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/07/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
06/07/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/07/2007 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support06/12/2007 Referred to
Senate Finance07/16/2007 Referred to
08/01/2008 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2608. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-328 (09/30/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on August 1, 2008. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

SSI Extension for Elderly and Disabled Refugees Act - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act, as amended by the Personal Responsibility and Work Opportunity Reconciliation Act of 1996, to extend through FY2011 the supplemental security income (SSI) benefits eligibility of certain aliens (refugees, asylees, and elderly noncitizens with pending naturalization applications) and victims of trafficking in persons, including such aliens and victims whose SSI benefits ceased in prior fiscal years. Requires a sworn declaration from such aliens or victims (except children under age 18) that they have made a good faith effort to pursue U.S. citizenship.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to require the Secretary of the Treasury to offset overpayments of federal taxes by any amount owed to a state for a covered unemployment compensation debt. Defines "covered unemployment compensation debt" as a past-due debt (including penalties and interest) for erroneous payment of state unemployment compensation due to fraud which has become final under state law and remains uncollected for not more than 10 years. Terminates the Secretary's offset authority after 10 years.

Requires states to notify by certified mail any individual who owes a covered unemployment compensation debt before taking action to offset such debt. Gives such individual 60 days to present evidence that such debt is not legally enforceable or was not incurred due to fraud. Authorizes the Secretary of the Treasury to issue regulations pertaining to such notices.