Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/07/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/07/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/07/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/07/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/07/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/07/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 06/07/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/11/2007