Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/07/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/07/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/07/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/07/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/07/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/07/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/19/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/26/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/26/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/26/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/26/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/26/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/28/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/28/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/28/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/11/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/11/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/11/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/11/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/11/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/11/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/11/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/11/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/02/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/24/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/24/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/24/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/02/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/12/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/12/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/12/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/12/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/12/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/12/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/22/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/22/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/25/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/25/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/25/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/01/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/05/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/05/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/05/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/05/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/10/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/13/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/13/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/17/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/06/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/01/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/02/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/02/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/08/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/10/2008