Refine your search

10 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
09/30/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-329. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2008 Signed by President.
09/29/2008 Presented to President.
09/27/2008 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate amendment to the bill by Yea-Nay. 78 - 12. Record Vote Number: 208.
09/24/2008 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree with an amendment to the Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 370 - 58, 1 Present (Roll no. 632).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9248-9289)
07/26/2007 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Byrd; Inouye; Leahy; Mikulski; Kohl; Murray; Landrieu; Lautenberg; Nelson NE; Cochran; Gregg; Stevens; Specter; Domenici; Shelby; Craig; Alexander.
07/26/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay. 89 - 4. Record Vote Number: 282.(text: CR 8/1/2007 S10660-10676)
06/15/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 268 - 150 (Roll no. 491).
06/08/2007 The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 110-181, by Mr. Price (NC).
06/08/2007 Introduced in House