Refine your search

Showing 12 of 12 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
09/27/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-84.
09/27/2007 Signed by President.
09/19/2007 Presented to President.
09/07/2007 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 292 - 97 (Roll no. 864).(consideration: CR S11241-11263)
09/07/2007 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 79 - 12. Record Vote Number: 326.
09/06/2007 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 110-317 filed.(text of conference report: CR H10168-10181)
09/05/2007 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
07/20/2007 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Kennedy; Dodd; Harkin; Mikulski; Bingaman; Murray; Reed; Clinton; Obama; Sanders; Brown; Enzi; Gregg; Alexander; Burr; Isakson; Murkowski; Hatch; Roberts; Allard; Coburn.(consideration: CR 7/19/2007 S9597)
07/20/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 78 - 18. Record Vote Number: 272.(text: CR S9661-9668)
07/11/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 273 - 149 (Roll no. 613).
06/25/2007 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 110-210.
06/12/2007 Introduced in House