Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/13/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/13/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/13/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/13/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/14/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/18/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/19/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/19/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/19/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/19/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/19/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/21/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/21/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/21/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/26/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/26/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/27/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/27/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/11/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/11/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/17/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/19/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/25/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/05/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/05/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/25/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/02/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/15/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/04/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/28/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/03/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/07/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/24/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/24/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/30/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/29/2008