Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/18/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/18/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/12/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/25/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 01/29/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/02/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 04/02/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/02/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/02/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/02/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/03/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/03/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/03/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/03/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/09/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/09/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/09/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/09/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/09/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/09/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/09/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/15/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/26/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/16/2008