Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/14/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/14/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/14/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/25/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/26/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/26/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/26/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 08/01/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/01/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/04/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/02/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/15/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/06/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/31/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/02/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/20/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/03/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/09/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/11/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/02/2008