Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/27/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/27/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/27/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/04/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/30/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/01/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/01/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/15/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/15/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 12/05/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/05/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/15/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/15/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/15/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 01/23/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/23/2008