Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/20/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/25/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/28/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/28/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/28/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/10/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 08/01/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 08/02/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 08/02/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/07/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/17/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/17/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/18/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/24/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/25/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/25/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/26/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/26/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/26/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/02/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/02/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/10/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/22/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/31/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 11/01/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/04/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/06/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/11/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/13/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 12/17/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/18/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/15/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/06/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/12/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/13/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/15/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/25/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/04/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/04/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/04/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/05/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/05/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/06/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/12/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/31/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/01/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/01/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/02/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/08/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/08/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/13/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/31/2008