Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/13/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/13/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/26/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/26/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/11/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/18/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/18/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/24/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/25/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/01/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/15/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/26/2008