Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/11/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/11/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/20/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/20/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/20/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/20/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/01/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/01/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/03/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/03/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/03/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/04/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/04/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/10/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/10/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/29/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/26/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/08/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/06/2008