Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/14/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/14/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/19/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/25/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 08/01/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/27/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/22/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 01/28/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/28/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/07/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/12/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/03/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/16/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/30/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/05/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/09/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/23/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/23/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/23/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/29/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/29/2008