Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/14/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/15/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/26/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/10/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/10/2007

Show cosponsors who withdrew