Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/17/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/18/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/18/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/18/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/18/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 06/18/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/18/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 06/23/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/24/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/26/2008