There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Integrated Deepwater Program Reform Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Integrated Deepwater Program Reform Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Integrated Deepwater Program Reform Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To restructure the Coast Guard Integrated Deepwater Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/31/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 426 - 0 (Roll No. 773).(text: CR H8930-8932)
07/30/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-270.
06/14/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
08/03/2007SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
08/01/2007SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/31/2007-3:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/31/2007-3:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 426 - 0 (Roll No. 773). (text: CR H8930-8932)
07/31/2007-3:07pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9229-9230)
07/30/2007-8:54pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/30/2007-8:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2722.
07/30/2007-8:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR 7/31/2007 H8930-8935)
07/30/2007-8:38pmHouseMr. Cummings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/30/2007HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 172.
07/30/2007HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-270.
06/28/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
06/28/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/26/2007HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation
06/26/2007HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation
06/15/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/14/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/14/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/15/2007

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/14/2007 Referred to
06/28/2007 Markup by
07/30/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-270
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation06/15/2007 Referred to
06/26/2007 Markup by
06/26/2007 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation08/03/2007 Referred to
House Homeland Security09/19/2007 Legislative interest

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2722. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/31/2007)

Integrated Deepwater Program Reform Act - Prohibits the Secretary of the department in which the Coast Guard is operating from using a private sector entity as a lead systems integrator for future Integrated Deepwater Systems Program (Program) procurements. Allows completion of existing delivery and task orders. Allows the Secretary to obtain assistance from federal agencies and, by grant, contract, or cooperative agreement, from private sector entities. Directs the Secretary, subject to exception, to use full and open competition for certain Deepwater Program acquisitions. Imposes other Program requirements, including certain required contract terms, development of a life cycle cost estimate, and assignment of a separate contract officers.

(Sec. 3) Requires the Coast Guard commandant to appoint or designate a career reserved employee as Chief Acquisition Officer for the Coast Guard to monitor Coast Guard acquisition activities, increase the use of full and open competition, and ensure the use of detailed performance specifications when performance-based contracting is used. Requires the commandant, subject to appropriations, to establish special rate supplements that provide higher pay levels for employees necessary to carry out the amendment made by this paragraph.

(Sec. 4) Directs the Secretary to cause each cutter, other than a National Security Cutter, acquired after enactment of this Act to be classed by the American Bureau of Shipping. Requires certain other testing and certification to be done by independent third parties. Requires the Secretary to cause the first in class of a major asset acquisition of a cutter or an aircraft to be subjected to an assessment of operational capability conducted by the Secretary of the Navy.

(Sec. 5) Requires specified reports, including concerning : (1) National Security Cutters; (2) the Program, (3) change orders; (4) technology risks and maturity; (5) cost overruns, (6) a plan for management of acquisitions programs, financial management, engineering and logistics management, and contract management; and (7) any Coast Guard mission performance gap due to the removal of Program assets from service.

(Sec. 7) Authorizes the Secretary to enter into a memorandum of understanding or a memorandum of agreement with the Secretary of the Navy to provide for the use of the Navy Systems Commands to assist the Coast Guard with the oversight of Coast Guard major acquisition programs.