Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/27/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/11/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/11/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/19/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/18/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/15/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/21/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/30/2008