Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/14/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/14/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/14/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/18/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/18/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/19/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/19/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/21/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/01/2007