Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 06/15/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 06/15/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/02/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/02/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/07/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/15/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/14/2008