Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/17/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/13/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/14/2007