Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/20/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/26/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/26/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/26/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/27/2007