Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/05/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/25/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/25/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/22/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/23/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/29/2007