Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/28/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/28/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/28/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/28/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/28/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/28/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/28/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/28/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/28/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/28/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/28/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/28/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/28/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/28/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/28/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/28/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/28/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/28/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/28/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/28/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/28/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/28/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/28/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/28/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/28/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/28/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/11/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/11/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/16/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/18/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/01/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 08/01/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 08/02/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/18/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/20/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/26/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/26/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/02/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/30/2007