There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Biofuels Research and Development Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Biofuels Research and Development Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enhance research, development, demonstration, and commercial application of biofuels related technologies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
08/03/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science and Technology. H. Rept. 110-302.
06/19/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
05/06/2008Hearings Held by Subcommittee on Engergy and Environment Prior to Introduction and Referral (June 14, 2007).
Action By: House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Energy and Environment
08/03/2007Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 189.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/03/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science and Technology. H. Rept. 110-302.
06/27/2007Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Science and Technology
06/27/2007Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science and Technology
06/21/2007Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Energy and Environment
06/21/2007Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Energy and Environment
06/20/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science and Technology
06/19/2007Referred to the House Committee on Science and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/19/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Science and Technology06/19/2007 Referred to
06/27/2007 Markup by
08/03/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-302
House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Energy and Environment06/20/2007 Referred to
05/06/2008 Hearings by
06/21/2007 Markup by
06/21/2007 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2773. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (08/03/2007)

Biofuels Research and Development Enhancement Act - (Sec. 2) Directs the Secretary of Energy to establish a technology transfer center to disseminate information on research, development, and commercial application of technologies related to specified biofuels and biorefineries, including: (1) biochemical and thermochemical conversion technologies to make fuels from lignocellulosic feedstocks; (2) biotechnology processes that emphasize enzyme-based processing systems; (3) biogas technologies; and (4) other advances to enable biofuel development.

(Sec. 3) Amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to instruct the Secretary to implement a biofuels research, development, and demonstration program related to existing transportation fuel distribution infrastructure and new alternative distribution infrastructure, focusing on the physical and chemical properties of biofuels and prevention of or mitigation against certain adverse impacts.

(Sec. 4) Requires the Secretary to report to Congress on challenges inherent in increasing to 2.5% the biodiesel proportion of diesel fuel sold in the United States.

Requires the Director of the National Institute of Standards and Technology to make publicly available the physical property data and characterization of biodiesel, in order to encourage standards that will promote their utilization in the transportation and fuel delivery system.

(Sec. 5) Directs the Secretary to report to Congress on challenges inherent in increasing to 5% of the transportation fuels sold in the United States fuel with biogas or a blend of biogas and natural gas.

(Sec. 6) Amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to direct the Secretary to establish five bioresearch centers, focusing on biofuels, one in each of the five Petroleum Administration for Defense Districts.

(Sec. 7) Directs the Secretary to make grants for research, development, demonstration, and commercial application of biofuel production technologies in states with low rates of ethanol production, including cellulosic biomass ethanol production.

(Sec. 8) Amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to direct the Secretary to establish: (1) a program of research, development, demonstration, and commercial application for increasing energy efficiency and reducing energy consumption in biorefinery facilities; and (2) a similar program for technologies and processes that enable the retrofitting of biorefineries that exclusively use corn grain or corn starch as a feedstock so that they can accept a range of biomass, including lignocellulosic feedstocks.

(Sec. 9) Requires the Secretary to study and report to Congress on: (1) methods of increasing U.S. consumption of ethanol-blended gasoline with levels of ethanol between 10% and 40%; (2) whether optimizing flexible fueled vehicles to use E-85 fuel would increase their fuel efficiency; and (3) the effects of biodiesel upon engine and engine system performance and durability.

(Sec. 12) Amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to authorize appropriations for bioenergy renewable energy research, development, demonstration, and commercial application activities for FY2010, and increase existing appropriations for FY2007-FY2009.

(Sec. 13) Amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to instruct the Secretary to include environmental science in the research, development, and demonstration program for systems biology.

Modifies the program goals of developing technologies and methods based on the biological functions of genomes, microbes, and plants that can perform specified functions. Revises the goal regarding the function of producing hydrogen to specify hydrogen in sustainable production systems that reduce greenhouse emissions. Adds a goal for the function of developing cellulosic and other feedstocks that are less resource and land intensive and that promote sustainable use of resources, including soil, water, energy, forests, and land, and ensure protection of air, water, and soil quality.

Requires the Secretary to establish a research and development program to: (1) improve and develop analytical tools to facilitate the analysis of life-cycle energy and greenhouse gas emissions, including emissions related to direct and indirect land use changes, attributable to all potential biofuel feedstocks and production processes; (2) promote the systematic evaluation of the impact of expanded biofuel production on the environment, including forestlands, and on the food supply for humans and animals; and (3) facilitate small-scale production, local, and on-farm use of biofuels, including the development of small-scale gasification technologies for production of biofuel from cellulosic feedstocks.

(Sec. 14) Directs the Secretary to study and report to Congress on increasing the fuel efficiency of vehicles using biogas by optimizing natural gas vehicle systems that can operate on it, including the advancement of vehicle fuel systems and the combination of hybrid-electric and plug-in hybrid electric drive platforms with natural gas vehicle systems using biogas.

Sec. 15) Directs the Secretary to: (1) develop standards for biofuel dispenser systems in order to promote broader biofuels adoption and utilization; and (2) report to Congress on research and development regarding the use of algae as a feedstock for biofuels production.