Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/05/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/05/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/09/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 01/11/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/11/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/16/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 01/18/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/05/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/20/2008