Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/28/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/28/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/28/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/28/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/17/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/31/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/31/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/31/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/31/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/31/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 08/01/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/03/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 08/03/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/07/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/07/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/24/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/24/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/12/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/12/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/24/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 11/08/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/08/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/11/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/17/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/29/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/07/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/25/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/06/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/03/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/03/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/03/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/03/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/09/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/17/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/17/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/01/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/14/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/14/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/14/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/12/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/10/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/10/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/15/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/23/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 08/01/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/23/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/26/2008