Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/10/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/31/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/28/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/13/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/20/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/22/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/22/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/22/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/22/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/22/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/23/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/29/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/29/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/20/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/20/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/20/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/01/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/24/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/24/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/07/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/07/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/07/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/07/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/21/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/27/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/18/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/11/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/20/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/01/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 10/01/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/01/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/04/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/10/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/29/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/29/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/12/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/01/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/01/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/08/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/08/2008