Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/27/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/27/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/27/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/05/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/04/2007