Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/25/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/28/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/10/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/11/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/11/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/16/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/16/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/19/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/23/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/24/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/24/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/24/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/24/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/24/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/25/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/25/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 07/25/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/25/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/25/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/25/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/25/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/25/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/25/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/27/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/27/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/27/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/27/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/27/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/27/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/27/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/01/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 08/01/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/01/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/07/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/07/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/26/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/26/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/01/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/13/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 12/13/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/13/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/13/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/13/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 12/13/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/13/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 12/13/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/13/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/19/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/19/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/19/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 12/19/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 02/07/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/27/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/06/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/11/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/31/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/31/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/03/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/03/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/03/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/14/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/14/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/14/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/18/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/24/2008