Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/21/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/21/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/21/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/21/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/26/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/26/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/19/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/19/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/19/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/05/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/25/2007