Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/19/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/26/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/02/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/06/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/06/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/06/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/13/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/13/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/02/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/05/2008