Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/25/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/28/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/28/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/28/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/28/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/28/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/28/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/23/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/23/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/23/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/25/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/01/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/04/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/04/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/04/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/22/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/29/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/07/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/07/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/29/2008