Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 06/26/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/26/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/26/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/26/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/26/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/26/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/28/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/19/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/06/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/14/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/10/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/10/2008