There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Health Care Improvement Act of 2007

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans' Health Care Improvement Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Health Care Improvement Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to make certain improvements in the provision of health care to veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/30/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8892-8895)
07/27/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 110-268.
06/27/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
08/03/2007SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/31/2007SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/30/2007-5:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/30/2007-5:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8892-8895)
07/30/2007-4:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2874.
07/30/2007-4:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR 7/31/2007 H8892-8897)
07/30/2007-4:46pmHouseMr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/27/2007HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 170.
07/27/2007HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 110-268.
07/17/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/17/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/11/2007HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
07/11/2007HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
06/28/2007HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
06/27/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/27/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/27/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/27/2007 Referred to
07/17/2007 Markup by
07/27/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-268
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/27/2007 Referred to
07/11/2007 Markup by
07/11/2007 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs08/03/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2874.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2874. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/30/2007)

Veterans' Health Care Improvement Act of 2007 - (Sec. 2) Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to make grants to private, nonprofit entities to conduct workshop programs to assist in the therapeutic readjustment and rehabilitation of veterans who served on active duty in a theater of combat operations after the Persian Gulf War, or in combat during a period of hostilities after November 11, 1998, and are discharged or released from active duty on or after September 11, 2001 (covered veterans). Limits grant amounts to $100,000. Requires annual reports from the Secretary to the congressional veterans committees on the use of such grants and their benefits to covered veterans. Authorizes appropriations.

(Sec. 3) Directs the Secretary to establish a grant program to provide innovative transportation options to veterans in remote rural areas. Limits grant amounts to $50,000. Authorizes appropriations.

(Sec. 4) Makes permanent (currently ends on December 31, 2007) the VA authority to treat participants in the Department of Defense (DOD) chemical biological testing conducted by Deseret Test Center.

(Sec. 5) Extends through FY2009 VA authority to collect health care copayments and certain medical care cost recovery amounts from veterans receiving such care.

(Sec. 6) Directs the Secretary to carry out a program to provide, through contracts with community mental health centers, peer outreach services, peer support services, and readjustment and mental health services to covered veterans. Requires training for covered veterans and clinicians providing services under the program.

(Sec. 7) Revises provisions concerning a joint VA-Department of Labor demonstration program of referral and counseling for veterans transitioning from certain institutions (including penal institutions) and who are at-risk for homelessness to: (1) remove the "demonstration" designation; (2) require the program to be carried out in at least 12 (under current law, six) locations; and (3) extend the program through FY2011.

(Sec. 8) Removes the FY2003-FY2004 limit on the authorization of appropriations for a VA program to provide domiciliary care programs for homeless veterans. Requires the Secretary to ensure that such programs are adequate, with respect to capacity and safety, to meet the needs of women veterans.

(Sec. 9) Directs the Secretary to provide financial assistance to private nonprofit organizations or consumer cooperatives to provide and coordinate supportive services for very low-income (less than 50% of the median income for the area) veteran families residing in permanent housing. Provides a preference for families who are transitioning from homelessness to permanent housing. Requires: (1) the provision of such assistance to be equitably distributed across geographic regions, including rural communities and tribal lands; and (2) the Secretary to provide appropriate training and technical assistance to entities providing such services. Authorizes appropriations.

(Sec. 10) Makes homeless veterans eligible for dental care through the VA after receiving certain other types of care (such as domiciliary or community residential care) through the VA for 30 (under current law, 60) consecutive days.