Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/25/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/01/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/01/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/09/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/09/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/10/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/10/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/16/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/16/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/16/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/30/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/30/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/30/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/30/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/30/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/30/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/14/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/14/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/31/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/17/2008