Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/28/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/11/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/11/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/11/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/31/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/15/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/21/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/21/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/22/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/22/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/04/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/04/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/05/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/23/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/26/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/09/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/23/2008