Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/27/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/27/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/01/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/05/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/07/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/10/2007