Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 08/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/27/2007