Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 08/01/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 08/01/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 08/01/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 08/03/2007