Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/10/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/10/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/10/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/10/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/24/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 08/02/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 08/02/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/02/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/02/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 08/02/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 08/03/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 08/03/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 08/03/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 08/04/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/04/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/11/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/14/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/24/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/24/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/24/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/24/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/27/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/27/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/27/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/27/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/15/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/16/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/29/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/05/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 11/05/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 11/05/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/05/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/08/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2008