Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/25/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/04/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/05/2008