Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/10/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/10/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/10/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/18/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/18/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/18/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/18/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/18/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/18/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/18/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/22/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/05/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/05/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/05/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/05/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/10/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/10/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/12/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/17/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/18/2008