Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/17/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/17/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/17/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/17/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/17/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/17/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 07/17/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/17/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/17/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/17/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/17/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/17/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/17/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/17/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/17/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/17/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/17/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/17/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/18/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/18/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/18/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/18/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/18/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/18/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/18/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/18/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/18/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/18/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 07/18/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/18/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/18/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/18/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/19/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/19/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/19/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/19/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/19/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/24/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/24/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/24/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/24/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/24/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/24/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/24/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/24/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/24/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/24/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/24/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/25/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/25/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/25/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/25/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/25/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/25/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/25/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/25/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/25/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/25/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/26/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/26/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/26/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/30/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/30/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/31/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/31/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/31/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/31/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 08/02/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 08/02/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 08/02/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 08/02/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 08/02/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 08/02/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 08/04/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 08/04/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 08/04/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 08/04/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/04/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 08/04/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 08/04/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 08/04/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/07/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/07/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/18/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/18/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 10/25/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/25/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 11/09/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/09/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/17/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/17/2008