Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/10/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/10/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/10/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/10/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/11/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/11/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/11/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/16/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/16/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/16/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/16/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/16/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/16/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/16/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/16/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 07/16/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/16/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/16/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/17/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/17/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/17/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/17/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/17/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/19/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/19/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/19/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/23/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/23/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/23/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/23/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/23/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/24/2007