Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/18/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 08/02/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 08/03/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/14/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/17/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/20/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/25/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/25/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/09/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/16/2007